LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2019-2020 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR181
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR181
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2019-2020 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR181
Action History
Senate
03/16/2020
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Assembly
03/12/2020
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4314.)
Assembly
03/05/2020
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 5).
Assembly
03/05/2020
Referred to Com. on RLS.
Assembly
03/03/2020
From printer.
Assembly
03/02/2020
Introduced. To print.