Senate | 05/26/2020 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2020 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 4338.) | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2020 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/12/2020 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 12). | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2020 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2020 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2020 | Introduced. To print. |