Assembly | 02/11/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 2, Statutes of 2019. | ||
Assembly | 02/11/2019 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2019 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 304.). | ||
Assembly | 02/04/2019 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2019 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 136.) | ||
Senate | 01/24/2019 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2019 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/15/2019 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/14/2019 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 164.) | ||
Assembly | 01/14/2019 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 01/10/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 10). | ||
Assembly | 01/10/2019 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 12/04/2018 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 12/03/2018 | Introduced. To print. |