Assembly | 04/02/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 25, Statutes of 2019. | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2019 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2019 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 420.) | ||
Senate | 03/20/2019 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2019 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2019 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 603.) | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2019 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (February 28). | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2019 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2019 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2019 | Introduced. To print. |