Senate | 03/04/2019 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2019 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 532.) | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2019 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (February 25). | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2019 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2019 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2019 | Introduced. To print. |