Assembly | 09/09/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 143, Statutes of 2019. | ||
Assembly | 09/09/2019 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 09/05/2019 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/04/2019 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2517.) | ||
Senate | 08/30/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). | ||
Senate | 06/24/2019 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/12/2019 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2019 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1638.) | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 8). | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2019 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2019 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2019 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 03/12/2019 | Introduced. To print. |