Assembly | 04/29/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 45, Statutes of 2019. | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2019 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2019 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2019 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 747.) | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2019 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2019 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 814.) | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2019 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 21). | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2019 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2019 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2019 | Introduced. To print. |