1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 54 CHAPTER 59Relative to California Holocaust Memorial Day. [ Filed with Secretary of State May 22, 2019. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 54, Gabriel. California Holocaust Memorial Day.This measure would proclaim April 29, 2019, as California Holocaust Memorial Day and would urge all Californians to observe this day of remembrance for the victims of the Holocaust in an appropriate manner.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The Holocaust was a tragedy of proportions the world had never before witnessed; andWHEREAS, More than 70 years have passed since the tragic events we now refer to as the Holocaust transpired, in which the dictatorship of Nazi Germany murdered six million Jews as part of a systematic program of genocide known as The Final Solution of the Jewish Question; andWHEREAS, Jews were the primary victims of the Holocaust, but they were not alone. Five million other people were murdered in Nazi concentration camps as part of a carefully orchestrated, state-sponsored program of cultural, social, and political annihilation under the Nazi regime; andWHEREAS, We must recognize the heroism of those who resisted the Nazis and provided assistance to the victims of the Nazi regime, including the many American soldiers who liberated concentration camps and provided comfort to those suffering; andWHEREAS, We must teach our children, and future generations, that the individual and communal acts of heroism during the Holocaust serve as a powerful example of how our nation and its citizens can, and must, respond to acts of hatred and inhumanity; andWHEREAS, We must always remind ourselves of the horrible events of the Holocaust and remain vigilant against anti-Semitism, racism, hatred, persecution, and tyranny of all forms, lest these atrocities be repeated; andWHEREAS, In recent years, public displays of anti-Semitism and anti-Semitic incidents have increased dramatically in California and around the world; andWHEREAS, We, the people of California, should actively rededicate ourselves to the principles of equality, human rights, individual freedom, and equal protection under the laws of a just and democratic society; andWHEREAS, Each person in California should set aside moments of their time every year to give remembrance to those who lost their lives in the Holocaust; andWHEREAS, The United States Holocaust Memorial Council recognizes the Days of Remembrance of the Victims of the Holocaust, including the Day of Remembrance, known as Yom Hashoah; andWHEREAS, According to Elie Wiesel, a Holocaust survivor and nationally recognized scholar, a memorial unresponsive to the future would violate the memory of the past; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature proclaims April 29, 2019, as California Holocaust Memorial Day, and that Californians are urged to observe this day of remembrance for victims of the Holocaust in an appropriate manner; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit sufficient copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled May 17, 2019 Passed IN Senate May 16, 2019 Passed IN Assembly April 29, 2019 Amended IN Assembly April 10, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 54Introduced by Assembly Member Gabriel(Principal coauthors: Assembly Members Bauer-Kahan, Berman, Bloom, Friedman, Levine, Medina, Nazarian, Blanca Rubio, Aguiar-Curry, Bigelow, Boerner Horvath, Bonta, Brough, Burke, Calderon, Carrillo, Cervantes, Chau, Chiu, Choi, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Dahle, Daly, Diep, Eggman, Flora, Fong, Frazier, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Gloria, Gonzalez, Gray, Grayson, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kamlager-Dove, Kiley, Lackey, Limn, Low, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Melendez, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Obernolte, ODonnell, Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Salas, Santiago, Smith, Mark Stone, Ting, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, Wicks, and Wood)(Principal coauthors: Senators Allen, Glazer, Hertzberg, Jackson, Rubio, Stern, and Wiener)March 19, 2019Relative to California Holocaust Memorial Day.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 54, Gabriel. California Holocaust Memorial Day.This measure would proclaim April 29, 2019, as California Holocaust Memorial Day and would urge all Californians to observe this day of remembrance for the victims of the Holocaust in an appropriate manner.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The Holocaust was a tragedy of proportions the world had never before witnessed; andWHEREAS, More than 70 years have passed since the tragic events we now refer to as the Holocaust transpired, in which the dictatorship of Nazi Germany murdered six million Jews as part of a systematic program of genocide known as The Final Solution of the Jewish Question; andWHEREAS, Jews were the primary victims of the Holocaust, but they were not alone. Five million other people were murdered in Nazi concentration camps as part of a carefully orchestrated, state-sponsored program of cultural, social, and political annihilation under the Nazi regime; andWHEREAS, We must recognize the heroism of those who resisted the Nazis and provided assistance to the victims of the Nazi regime, including the many American soldiers who liberated concentration camps and provided comfort to those suffering; andWHEREAS, We must teach our children, and future generations, that the individual and communal acts of heroism during the Holocaust serve as a powerful example of how our nation and its citizens can, and must, respond to acts of hatred and inhumanity; andWHEREAS, We must always remind ourselves of the horrible events of the Holocaust and remain vigilant against anti-Semitism, racism, hatred, persecution, and tyranny of all forms, lest these atrocities be repeated; andWHEREAS, In recent years, public displays of anti-Semitism and anti-Semitic incidents have increased dramatically in California and around the world; andWHEREAS, We, the people of California, should actively rededicate ourselves to the principles of equality, human rights, individual freedom, and equal protection under the laws of a just and democratic society; andWHEREAS, Each person in California should set aside moments of their time every year to give remembrance to those who lost their lives in the Holocaust; andWHEREAS, The United States Holocaust Memorial Council recognizes the Days of Remembrance of the Victims of the Holocaust, including the Day of Remembrance, known as Yom Hashoah; andWHEREAS, According to Elie Wiesel, a Holocaust survivor and nationally recognized scholar, a memorial unresponsive to the future would violate the memory of the past; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature proclaims April 29, 2019, as California Holocaust Memorial Day, and that Californians are urged to observe this day of remembrance for victims of the Holocaust in an appropriate manner; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit sufficient copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|