Assembly | 06/25/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 93, Statutes of 2019. | ||
Assembly | 06/25/2019 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2019 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/20/2019 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1679.) | ||
Senate | 06/17/2019 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/12/2019 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2019 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2019 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2129.) | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 24). | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2019 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2019 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2019 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2019 | Introduced. To print. |