1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 68 CHAPTER 61 Relative to Girls on the Run of Greater Sacramento Day. [ Filed with Secretary of State May 22, 2019. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 68, McCarty. Girls on the Run of Greater Sacramento Day.This measure would recognize May 11, 2019, as Girls on the Run of Greater Sacramento Day and proclaim that schools across the Sacramento region encourage girls in grades 3 to 8, inclusive, to get involved and participate in a nearby Girls on the Run program.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Founded in 2002, Girls on the Run of Greater Sacramento is a nonprofit organization that provides after-school running programs in Sacramento, Yolo, and the western slopes of Placer and El Dorado Counties for girls in grades 3 to 8, inclusive; andWHEREAS, Girls face social pressures and conflicting messages about how they should act and who they should be. Studies show that by their adolescence, girls confidence drops about twice as much as boys, their friendships become more complicated and challenging, their perception of their academic abilities declines, their likelihood of anxiety and depression increases, and their participation in physical activity plummets; andWHEREAS, A 2016 independent study led by Dr. Maureen Weiss of the University of Minnesota found that the national Girls on the Run programs intentional life skills curriculum and highly trained coaches positively impact girls lives by helping them increase self-confidence, develop healthy relationships, and feel good about themselves. Simply put, Girls on the Run inspires girls to recognize their inner strength and celebrate what makes them one of a kind; andWHEREAS, Through the Girls on the Run of Greater Sacramento program, trained coaches lead small teams through research-based curricula, which includes dynamic discussions, activities, and running games. Over the course of the 10-week program, girls in grades 3 to 8, inclusive, develop essential skills to help them navigate their worlds and establish a lifetime appreciation for emotional and physical health and fitness; andWHEREAS, Girls on the Run of Greater Sacramento provides a safe and enriching after-school option for kids who might not otherwise have access to either; andWHEREAS, The Girls on the Run of Greater Sacramento program culminates with girls positively impacting their communities through service projects and being physically and emotionally prepared to complete a celebratory 5K event that includes more than 1,000 participants; andWHEREAS, For 2019, Girls on the Run of Greater Sacramento has more than 600 registered participants at 45 schools across four counties in the Greater Sacramento region; andWHEREAS, Since its inception, Girls on the Run of Greater Sacramento has proudly served more than 5,000 families, and has been able to provide financial assistance to nearly one-half of its participants who otherwise would not have been able to participate; andWHEREAS, Empowering young women to recognize their strengths and to support one another is more timely now than ever; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby recognizes May 11, 2019, as Girls on the Run of Greater Sacramento Day; and be it furtherResolved, That schools across the Sacramento region encourage girls in grades 3 to 8, inclusive, to get involved and participate in a nearby Girls on the Run program; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled May 17, 2019 Passed IN Senate May 16, 2019 Passed IN Assembly April 29, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 68Introduced by Assembly Member McCarty(Coauthors: Assembly Members Aguiar-Curry, Cooley, Cooper, Kiley, Bauer-Kahan, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Boerner Horvath, Bonta, Brough, Burke, Calderon, Carrillo, Cervantes, Chau, Chiu, Choi, Chu, Cunningham, Dahle, Daly, Diep, Eggman, Flora, Fong, Frazier, Gabriel, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Gloria, Gonzalez, Gray, Grayson, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kamlager-Dove, Lackey, Levine, Limn, Low, Mathis, Mayes, Medina, Melendez, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, ODonnell, Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Smith, Mark Stone, Ting, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, Wicks, and Wood)(Coauthor: Senator Pan)April 09, 2019 Relative to Girls on the Run of Greater Sacramento Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 68, McCarty. Girls on the Run of Greater Sacramento Day.This measure would recognize May 11, 2019, as Girls on the Run of Greater Sacramento Day and proclaim that schools across the Sacramento region encourage girls in grades 3 to 8, inclusive, to get involved and participate in a nearby Girls on the Run program.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Founded in 2002, Girls on the Run of Greater Sacramento is a nonprofit organization that provides after-school running programs in Sacramento, Yolo, and the western slopes of Placer and El Dorado Counties for girls in grades 3 to 8, inclusive; andWHEREAS, Girls face social pressures and conflicting messages about how they should act and who they should be. Studies show that by their adolescence, girls confidence drops about twice as much as boys, their friendships become more complicated and challenging, their perception of their academic abilities declines, their likelihood of anxiety and depression increases, and their participation in physical activity plummets; andWHEREAS, A 2016 independent study led by Dr. Maureen Weiss of the University of Minnesota found that the national Girls on the Run programs intentional life skills curriculum and highly trained coaches positively impact girls lives by helping them increase self-confidence, develop healthy relationships, and feel good about themselves. Simply put, Girls on the Run inspires girls to recognize their inner strength and celebrate what makes them one of a kind; andWHEREAS, Through the Girls on the Run of Greater Sacramento program, trained coaches lead small teams through research-based curricula, which includes dynamic discussions, activities, and running games. Over the course of the 10-week program, girls in grades 3 to 8, inclusive, develop essential skills to help them navigate their worlds and establish a lifetime appreciation for emotional and physical health and fitness; andWHEREAS, Girls on the Run of Greater Sacramento provides a safe and enriching after-school option for kids who might not otherwise have access to either; andWHEREAS, The Girls on the Run of Greater Sacramento program culminates with girls positively impacting their communities through service projects and being physically and emotionally prepared to complete a celebratory 5K event that includes more than 1,000 participants; andWHEREAS, For 2019, Girls on the Run of Greater Sacramento has more than 600 registered participants at 45 schools across four counties in the Greater Sacramento region; andWHEREAS, Since its inception, Girls on the Run of Greater Sacramento has proudly served more than 5,000 families, and has been able to provide financial assistance to nearly one-half of its participants who otherwise would not have been able to participate; andWHEREAS, Empowering young women to recognize their strengths and to support one another is more timely now than ever; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby recognizes May 11, 2019, as Girls on the Run of Greater Sacramento Day; and be it furtherResolved, That schools across the Sacramento region encourage girls in grades 3 to 8, inclusive, to get involved and participate in a nearby Girls on the Run program; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|