1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 72 CHAPTER 70 Relative to Star Wars Day. [ Filed with Secretary of State May 31, 2019. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 72, Daly. Star Wars Day.This measure would declare May 4, 2019, as Star Wars Day and would recognize the Star Wars franchise upon the celebration of the opening of Star Wars: Galaxys Edge at the Disneyland Resort.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Star Wars is a film series created by George Lucas that became one of the most successful and influential franchises in motion picture history; andWHEREAS, The first movie, Star Wars: A New Hope, was released in 1977 and was made for only $11 million. It won six Academy Awards, along with a special achievement award for its accomplishments in sound, and revolutionized the motion picture industry with its achievements in special effects; andWHEREAS, Since then, the Star Wars franchise has captured the imaginations and hearts of many and has remained a beloved franchise into the 21st century; andWHEREAS, May the Fourth be with you, which started as a pun warmly shared by fans, has become a full-fledged fan celebration of Star Wars; andWHEREAS, The Walt Disney Company has fully embraced the spirit of May the Fourth fandom that makes the day so special; andWHEREAS, The Disneyland Resort is a leading destination for visitors to California and has welcomed over 800 million guests since it first opened its doors on July 17, 1955; andWHEREAS, In 1987, Lucasfilm Ltd. entered into a joint venture with the Walt Disney Company to create the Star Tours attraction at Disneyland; andWHEREAS, In 2012, the Walt Disney Company acquired the Star Wars franchise, providing new opportunities to expand on this galaxy far, far away; andWHEREAS, On August 15, 2015, the Walt Disney Company chairman and chief executive officer announced that a Star Wars-themed land would come to the Disneyland park at the D23 Expo in Anaheim, California; andWHEREAS, The ambitious project represents the largest single site expansion to date of Disneyland Park, representing an investment of over $1 billion; andWHEREAS, The fully immersive land will open on May 31, 2019, and will be known as Star Wars: Galaxys Edge; andWHEREAS, With 30,000 cast members, the Disneyland Resort is Orange Countys largest employer and generates $5.7 billion for the southern California economy; andWHEREAS, The City of Anaheim will benefit immensely from the opening of Star Wars: Galaxys Edge, with at least $14 million more in tax revenues per year; andWHEREAS, The expansion created 5,500 temporary construction and artisan jobs and will create an additional 1,400 permanent jobs upon operation; andWHEREAS, In the lead up to the opening of Star Wars: Galaxys Edge, both the Walt Disney Company and its world-renowned theme park are worthy of the highest commendations for this exciting project, driving visitation to the state and generating significant revenues benefitting the community; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes the Star Wars franchise upon the celebration of the opening of Star Wars: Galaxys Edge, the largest single site expansion to date of Disneyland Park, and commends the Disneyland Resort and the Walt Disney Company for their decades-long record of enhancing the quality of life for people in California and beyond; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature declares May 4, 2019, as Star Wars Day; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled May 28, 2019 Passed IN Senate May 23, 2019 Passed IN Assembly May 02, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 72Introduced by Assembly Member Daly(Principal coauthor: Senator Umberg)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Brough, Chen, Choi, Diep, Petrie-Norris, Quirk-Silva, Aguiar-Curry, Bauer-Kahan, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Boerner Horvath, Bonta, Burke, Calderon, Carrillo, Cervantes, Chau, Chiu, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Dahle, Eggman, Flora, Fong, Frazier, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Gloria, Gonzalez, Gray, Grayson, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kamlager-Dove, Lackey, Levine, Limn, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, Obernolte, ODonnell, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Smith, Mark Stone, Ting, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, Wicks, and Wood)(Coauthors: Senators Archuleta, Bates, Chang, and Moorlach)April 22, 2019 Relative to Star Wars Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 72, Daly. Star Wars Day.This measure would declare May 4, 2019, as Star Wars Day and would recognize the Star Wars franchise upon the celebration of the opening of Star Wars: Galaxys Edge at the Disneyland Resort.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Star Wars is a film series created by George Lucas that became one of the most successful and influential franchises in motion picture history; andWHEREAS, The first movie, Star Wars: A New Hope, was released in 1977 and was made for only $11 million. It won six Academy Awards, along with a special achievement award for its accomplishments in sound, and revolutionized the motion picture industry with its achievements in special effects; andWHEREAS, Since then, the Star Wars franchise has captured the imaginations and hearts of many and has remained a beloved franchise into the 21st century; andWHEREAS, May the Fourth be with you, which started as a pun warmly shared by fans, has become a full-fledged fan celebration of Star Wars; andWHEREAS, The Walt Disney Company has fully embraced the spirit of May the Fourth fandom that makes the day so special; andWHEREAS, The Disneyland Resort is a leading destination for visitors to California and has welcomed over 800 million guests since it first opened its doors on July 17, 1955; andWHEREAS, In 1987, Lucasfilm Ltd. entered into a joint venture with the Walt Disney Company to create the Star Tours attraction at Disneyland; andWHEREAS, In 2012, the Walt Disney Company acquired the Star Wars franchise, providing new opportunities to expand on this galaxy far, far away; andWHEREAS, On August 15, 2015, the Walt Disney Company chairman and chief executive officer announced that a Star Wars-themed land would come to the Disneyland park at the D23 Expo in Anaheim, California; andWHEREAS, The ambitious project represents the largest single site expansion to date of Disneyland Park, representing an investment of over $1 billion; andWHEREAS, The fully immersive land will open on May 31, 2019, and will be known as Star Wars: Galaxys Edge; andWHEREAS, With 30,000 cast members, the Disneyland Resort is Orange Countys largest employer and generates $5.7 billion for the southern California economy; andWHEREAS, The City of Anaheim will benefit immensely from the opening of Star Wars: Galaxys Edge, with at least $14 million more in tax revenues per year; andWHEREAS, The expansion created 5,500 temporary construction and artisan jobs and will create an additional 1,400 permanent jobs upon operation; andWHEREAS, In the lead up to the opening of Star Wars: Galaxys Edge, both the Walt Disney Company and its world-renowned theme park are worthy of the highest commendations for this exciting project, driving visitation to the state and generating significant revenues benefitting the community; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes the Star Wars franchise upon the celebration of the opening of Star Wars: Galaxys Edge, the largest single site expansion to date of Disneyland Park, and commends the Disneyland Resort and the Walt Disney Company for their decades-long record of enhancing the quality of life for people in California and beyond; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature declares May 4, 2019, as Star Wars Day; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|