Assembly | 06/04/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 74, Statutes of 2019. | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2019 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2019 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2019 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1384.) | ||
Senate | 05/28/2019 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2019 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2019 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 1611.) | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2019 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 6). | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2019 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2019 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2019 | Introduced. To print. |