1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 80 CHAPTER 77Relative to Infrastructure Week. [ Filed with Secretary of State June 04, 2019. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 80, Levine. Infrastructure Week.This measure would recognize the week of May 13, 2019, to May 20, 2019, inclusive, as Infrastructure Week, and would urge the citizens of California to join in this special observance with appropriate events and commemorations. Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The week of May 13, 2019, to May 20, 2019, inclusive, is observed in California and nationally as Infrastructure Week; and WHEREAS, The residents of California rely on critical infrastructure, including our roads and bridges, our railroads and transit systems, our ports and airports, our pipes and water system, our reliable power supply, our access to broadband, and our connectivity to the regional, nationalan class="Whereas" id="id_6548879B-2F1A-43CF-80AF-A48883D5B55E">WHEREAS, Americans are waiting in traffic, wasting time and money because of our poor infrastructure; andWHEREAS, Every dollar invested in infrastructure generates nearly two dollars ($2) in economic output; andWHEREAS, To grow our economy, keep Americans safe, and strengthen communities, we need all levels of government and the private sector to work together to rebuild and repair our nations critical infrastructure; andWHEREAS, Infrastructure Week 2019 has been established to highlight infrastructure investment needs, and to recognize and encourage leadership at the federal, state, and local levels; andWHEREAS, Infrastructure Week challenges policymakers and the public to address the challenges facing the United States infrastructure, to move beyond short-term fixes and deferred maintenance, and to envision the innovative solutions, technologies, policies, and investments that will improve Americas infrastructure future; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes the week of May 13, 2019, to May 20, 2019, as Infrastructure Week, and urges the citizens of California to join in this special observance with appropriate events and commemorations; and be it further Resolved, That despite fiscal challenges, it is important for California to dedicate sufficient resources to transportation and infrastructure investments in our community; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled May 31, 2019 Passed IN Senate May 30, 2019 Passed IN Assembly May 09, 2019 Amended IN Assembly May 02, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 80Introduced by Assembly Member LevineApril 29, 2019Relative to Infrastructure Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 80, Levine. Infrastructure Week.This measure would recognize the week of May 13, 2019, to May 20, 2019, inclusive, as Infrastructure Week, and would urge the citizens of California to join in this special observance with appropriate events and commemorations. Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The week of May 13, 2019, to May 20, 2019, inclusive, is observed in California and nationally as Infrastructure Week; and WHEREAS, The residents of California rely on critical infrastructure, including our roads and bridges, our railroads and transit systems, our ports and airports, our pipes and water system, our reliable power supply, our access to broadband, and our connectivity to the regional, national, and global economy; andWHEREAS, This infrastructure enhances our local and regional economy, our quality of life, our safety, and the strength of our communities; andWHEREAS, Decades of underfunding and deferred maintenance have pushed infrastructure to the brink of a national crisis, with preventable catastrophic failures, including derailments and collapses, occurring as a result; andWHEREAS, The United States of America risks compromising its competitive advantage over foreign economies by failing to invest adequately in its infrastructure; andWHEREAS, Americans are waiting in traffic, wasting time and money because of our poor infrastructure; andWHEREAS, Every dollar invested in infrastructure generates nearly two dollars ($2) in economic output; andWHEREAS, To grow our economy, keep Americans safe, and strengthen communities, we need all levels of government and the private sector to work together to rebuild and repair our nations critical infrastructure; andWHEREAS, Infrastructure Week 2019 has been established to highlight infrastructure investment needs, and to recognize and encourage leadership at the federal, state, and local levels; andWHEREAS, Infrastructure Week challenges policymakers and the public to address the challenges facing the United States infrastructure, to move beyond short-term fixes and deferred maintenance, and to envision the innovative solutions, technologies, policies, and investments that will improve Americas infrastructure future; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes the week of May 13, 2019, to May 20, 2019, as Infrastructure Week, and urges the citizens of California to join in this special observance with appropriate events and commemorations; and be it further Resolved, That despite fiscal challenges, it is important for California to dedicate sufficient resources to transportation and infrastructure investments in our community; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|