1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 85 CHAPTER 81Relative to Ramadan. [ Filed with Secretary of State June 06, 2019. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 85, Reyes. Ramadan.This measure would acknowledge the Muslim holy month of Ramadan and express the Legislatures respect to Muslims across California and throughout the world on this occasion.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Islam is one of the worlds major religions and part of our shared human heritage; and WHEREAS, Californias Muslim community is one of the most diverse in the nation with ethnic and cultural backgrounds that span the globe; and WHEREAS, Muslims have a long history in the United States, spanning back to the slave trade, in which 10 to 15 percent of the enslaved African people were said to be Muslim; andWHEREAS, Muslims have long served in the nations armed forces and fought in all major United States wars, from the American Revolutionary War to modern conflicts today, with some Muslim Americans making the ultimate sacrifice in combat; and WHEREAS, Muslims have contributed to social movements throughout the history of the United States in order to work toward justice and fair inclusion for all; andWHEREAS, From the early days of the pioneers to our present day leaders, Muslim Americans have played a significant role in the history of this states economic, cultural, spiritual, and political development; and WHEREAS, There are approximately one million Muslim Americans across this state, contributing to its economy, social fabric, and multicultural and pluralistic traditions; and WHEREAS, The Muslim residents of this state, with their hard work and contributions to medicine, science, information technology, education, police, military, and many other fields, have benefited from and enriched the states open, tolerant, and economically vibrant environment; and WHEREAS, Ramadan is a time to reflect spiritually, build communally, and aid those in need and marks an annual spiritual renewal for each individual, a reason to celebrate and express gratitude in this month; and WHEREAS, On May 14, 2019, the State Capitol will host the 16th annual Ramadan Capitol Iftar, a dinner marking the end of fasting on that day at dusk; and WHEREAS, Ramadan is the holy month of fasting and spiritual renewal for Muslims worldwide, and is the ninth month of the Muslim calendar year; and WHEREAS, The observance of the Muslim holy month of Ramadan commences at dusk on May 5, 2019, and continues for one lunar month, from sunrise to sunset each day; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That in observance of and out of respect for the commencement of Ramadan, the Muslim holy month of fasting and spiritual renewal, the Legislature acknowledges the onset of Ramadan and expresses its deepest respect to Muslims across California and throughout the world on this significant occasion; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled June 04, 2019 Passed IN Senate June 03, 2019 Passed IN Assembly May 13, 2019 Amended IN Assembly May 06, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 85Introduced by Assembly Member Reyes(Coauthors: Assembly Members Chau, Chiu, Gabriel, Gipson, Gonzalez, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Weber, Aguiar-Curry, Bauer-Kahan, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Boerner Horvath, Bonta, Calderon, Carrillo, Cervantes, Chen, Choi, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Dahle, Daly, Diep, Eggman, Flora, Fong, Friedman, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gray, Grayson, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kamlager-Dove, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Limn, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Nazarian, ODonnell, Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Smith, Mark Stone, Ting, Voepel, Waldron, Wicks, and Wood)(Coauthors: Senators Durazo and Pan)May 01, 2019Relative to Ramadan. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 85, Reyes. Ramadan.This measure would acknowledge the Muslim holy month of Ramadan and express the Legislatures respect to Muslims across California and throughout the world on this occasion.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Islam is one of the worlds major religions and part of our shared human heritage; and WHEREAS, Californias Muslim community is one of the most diverse in the nation with ethnic and cultural backgrounds that span the globe; and WHEREAS, Muslims have a long history in the United States, spanning back to the slave trade, in which 10 to 15 percent of the enslaved African people were said to be Muslim; andWHEREAS, Muslims have long served in the nations armed forces and fought in all major United States wars, from the American Revolutionary War to modern conflicts today, with some Muslim Americans making the ultimate sacrifice in combat; and WHEREAS, Muslims have contributed to social movements throughout the history of the United States in order to work toward justice and fair inclusion for all; andWHEREAS, From the early days of the pioneers to our present day leaders, Muslim Americans have played a significant role in the history of this states economic, cultural, spiritual, and political development; and WHEREAS, There are approximately one million Muslim Americans across this state, contributing to its economy, social fabric, and multicultural and pluralistic traditions; and WHEREAS, The Muslim residents of this state, with their hard work and contributions to medicine, science, information technology, education, police, military, and many other fields, have benefited from and enriched the states open, tolerant, and economically vibrant environment; and WHEREAS, Ramadan is a time to reflect spiritually, build communally, and aid those in need and marks an annual spiritual renewal for each individual, a reason to celebrate and express gratitude in this month; and WHEREAS, On May 14, 2019, the State Capitol will host the 16th annual Ramadan Capitol Iftar, a dinner marking the end of fasting on that day at dusk; and WHEREAS, Ramadan is the holy month of fasting and spiritual renewal for Muslims worldwide, and is the ninth month of the Muslim calendar year; and WHEREAS, The observance of the Muslim holy month of Ramadan commences at dusk on May 5, 2019, and continues for one lunar month, from sunrise to sunset each day; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That in observance of and out of respect for the commencement of Ramadan, the Muslim holy month of fasting and spiritual renewal, the Legislature acknowledges the onset of Ramadan and expresses its deepest respect to Muslims across California and throughout the world on this significant occasion; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|