Assembly | 07/23/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 123, Statutes of 2019. | ||
Assembly | 07/23/2019 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 07/11/2019 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 07/11/2019 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2056.) | ||
Senate | 07/03/2019 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/26/2019 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/18/2019 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/17/2019 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 2295.) | ||
Assembly | 06/17/2019 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/13/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 13). | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2019 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2019 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2019 | Introduced. To print. |