Assembly | 06/25/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 95, Statutes of 2019. | ||
Assembly | 06/25/2019 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2019 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/20/2019 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1678.) | ||
Senate | 06/17/2019 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/05/2019 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2019 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2019 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1830.) | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 16). | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2019 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2019 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2019 | Introduced. To print. |