California 2019 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR88 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 06/21/2019

                    Enrolled  June 21, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  June 20, 2019 Passed IN  Assembly  May 22, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 88Introduced by Assembly Member ReyesMay 02, 2019 Relative to Older Americans Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 88, Reyes. Older Americans Month.This measure would recognize the month of May 2019 as Older Americans Month and would encourage all Californians to recognize and treat all older adults with compassion and respect, and to participate in services and activities that contribute to the health, welfare, and happiness of older adults.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Older adults reflect the beauty, strength, and struggle of the people in our state; and WHEREAS, The California Senior Legislature has worked with older adults since 1981 to prioritize legislation on topics such as social services, long-term health, and housing and development; and WHEREAS, It is important to acknowledge the critical contributions older adults have made in our communities to foster inclusivity, diversity, and cultural competency; and WHEREAS, Elder justice assures the right and equitable treatment of older adults in all aspects of life; and WHEREAS, Older adults are the fastest growing population in California, where 1,000 Californians turn 65 years of age each day and the number of Californians above 60 years of age is due to increase from 7,600,000 individuals to 10,800,000 individuals by the year 2050; and WHEREAS, People of color will make up over one-half of Californias senior population by the year 2035, with the Latinx and Asian-Pacific Islander community making up the fastest growing racial and ethnic older adult population; and WHEREAS, Women make up the majority of Californias older population; andWHEREAS, The State of California is prioritizing its older adults with a proposed master plan on aging that aims to create streamlined access to care, a properly trained and competent workforce, and a commitment to ensuring older adults may age in their own home with dignity; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature of the State of California recognizes the month of May 2019 as Older Americans Month; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature encourages all Californians to recognize and treat all older adults with compassion and respect, and to participate in services and activities that contribute to the health, welfare, and happiness of older adults; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  June 21, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  June 20, 2019 Passed IN  Assembly  May 22, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 88Introduced by Assembly Member ReyesMay 02, 2019 Relative to Older Americans Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 88, Reyes. Older Americans Month.This measure would recognize the month of May 2019 as Older Americans Month and would encourage all Californians to recognize and treat all older adults with compassion and respect, and to participate in services and activities that contribute to the health, welfare, and happiness of older adults.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO 

 Enrolled  June 21, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  June 20, 2019 Passed IN  Assembly  May 22, 2019

Enrolled  June 21, 2019
Passed IN  Senate  June 20, 2019
Passed IN  Assembly  May 22, 2019

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION

Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 88

Introduced by Assembly Member ReyesMay 02, 2019

Introduced by Assembly Member Reyes
May 02, 2019

 Relative to Older Americans Month. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

ACR 88, Reyes. Older Americans Month.

This measure would recognize the month of May 2019 as Older Americans Month and would encourage all Californians to recognize and treat all older adults with compassion and respect, and to participate in services and activities that contribute to the health, welfare, and happiness of older adults.

This measure would recognize the month of May 2019 as Older Americans Month and would encourage all Californians to recognize and treat all older adults with compassion and respect, and to participate in services and activities that contribute to the health, welfare, and happiness of older adults.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, Older adults reflect the beauty, strength, and struggle of the people in our state; and 

WHEREAS, The California Senior Legislature has worked with older adults since 1981 to prioritize legislation on topics such as social services, long-term health, and housing and development; and 

WHEREAS, It is important to acknowledge the critical contributions older adults have made in our communities to foster inclusivity, diversity, and cultural competency; and 

WHEREAS, Elder justice assures the right and equitable treatment of older adults in all aspects of life; and 

WHEREAS, Older adults are the fastest growing population in California, where 1,000 Californians turn 65 years of age each day and the number of Californians above 60 years of age is due to increase from 7,600,000 individuals to 10,800,000 individuals by the year 2050; and 

WHEREAS, People of color will make up over one-half of Californias senior population by the year 2035, with the Latinx and Asian-Pacific Islander community making up the fastest growing racial and ethnic older adult population; and 

WHEREAS, Women make up the majority of Californias older population; and

WHEREAS, The State of California is prioritizing its older adults with a proposed master plan on aging that aims to create streamlined access to care, a properly trained and competent workforce, and a commitment to ensuring older adults may age in their own home with dignity; now, therefore, be it 

Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature of the State of California recognizes the month of May 2019 as Older Americans Month; and be it further 

Resolved, That the Legislature encourages all Californians to recognize and treat all older adults with compassion and respect, and to participate in services and activities that contribute to the health, welfare, and happiness of older adults; and be it further 

Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.