Assembly | 09/26/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 167, Statutes of 2019. | ||
Assembly | 09/26/2019 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 09/09/2019 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/09/2019 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 2692.) | ||
Senate | 07/03/2019 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/24/2019 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2019 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 2364.) | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2019 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/11/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11). | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2019 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2019 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2019 | Introduced. To print. |