Senate | 01/09/2020 | In committee: Hearing cancelled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 09/04/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 08/27/2019 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/26/2019 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2842.) | ||
Assembly | 08/26/2019 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 08/21/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 21). | ||
Assembly | 08/14/2019 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 07/10/2019 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2019 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2019 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2019 | Introduced. To print. |