Assembly | 09/09/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 147, Statutes of 2019. | ||
Assembly | 09/09/2019 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 09/05/2019 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/04/2019 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2524.) | ||
Senate | 07/03/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2). | ||
Senate | 06/19/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. | ||
Senate | 06/17/2019 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/17/2019 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2312.) | ||
Assembly | 06/12/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11). | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2019 | Referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2019 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2019 | Introduced. To print. |