Assembly | 09/11/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 150, Statutes of 2019. | ||
Assembly | 09/11/2019 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 09/05/2019 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3010.). | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2019 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | ||
Senate | 08/30/2019 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2327.) | ||
Senate | 08/28/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/27/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 27). | ||
Senate | 08/14/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 06/05/2019 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2019 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1242.) | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2019 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 10). | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2019 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2019 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2019 | Introduced. To print. |