Senate | 09/11/2019 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 09/10/2019 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3249.) | ||
Assembly | 09/10/2019 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 09/09/2019 | Assembly Rule 74(d) suspended. (Page 3090.) | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30). | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2019 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 06/11/2019 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2019 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2019 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2019 | Introduced. To print. |