Assembly | 09/26/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 183, Statutes of 2019. | ||
Assembly | 09/26/2019 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 09/09/2019 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 3135.). | ||
Assembly | 09/05/2019 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | ||
Senate | 09/04/2019 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 2514.) | ||
Senate | 08/28/2019 | Amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/27/2019 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 27). | ||
Senate | 07/10/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 07/01/2019 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/27/2019 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 0. Page 2455.) | ||
Assembly | 06/27/2019 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18). | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2019 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2019 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2019 | Introduced. To print. |