Senate | 08/21/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. | ||
Senate | 08/13/2019 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/12/2019 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2662.) | ||
Assembly | 08/12/2019 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 07/10/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 9). | ||
Assembly | 06/13/2019 | Referred to Com. on V.A. | ||
Assembly | 06/11/2019 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2019 | Introduced. To print. |