Senate | 09/04/2019 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 09/03/2019 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 4. Page 2948.) | ||
Assembly | 09/03/2019 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 08/27/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (August 26). | ||
Assembly | 06/24/2019 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2019 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2019 | Introduced. To print. |