California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AJR36 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 06/17/2020

                            CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Joint Resolution No. 36Introduced by Assembly Member LackeyJune 17, 2020 Relative to Juneteenth Independence Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAJR 36, as introduced, Lackey. Juneteenth Independence Day.This measure would urge the President of the United States to declare June 19, commonly known as Juneteenth Independence Day, as a federal holiday.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, News of the end of slavery did not reach the frontier areas of the United States, in particular the southwestern states, until months after the conclusion of the Civil War, more than two and one-half years after President Abraham Lincoln issued the Emancipation Proclamation on September 22, 1862, effective on January 1, 1863; andWHEREAS, On June 19, 1865, Union soldiers, led by Major General Gordon Granger, arrived in Galveston, Texas, with news that the Civil War had ended and the enslaved were free; andWHEREAS, African Americans who had been slaves in the southwest celebrated June 19, commonly known as Juneteenth Independence Day, as inspiration and encouragement for future generations; andWHEREAS, African Americans from all over the United States have continued the tradition of observing Juneteenth Independence Day for more than 150 years; andWHEREAS, Juneteenth Independence Day began as a holiday in the state of Texas and is now celebrated in 47 states and the District of Columbia as a special day of observance in recognition of the emancipation of all slaves in the United States; andWHEREAS, Juneteenth Independence Day celebrations have been held to honor African American freedom while encouraging self-development and respect for all cultures; andWHEREAS, The faith and strength of character demonstrated by former slaves and the descendants of former slaves remain an example for all people of the United States, regardless of background, religion, or race; andWHEREAS, Slavery was not officially abolished until the ratification of the 13th Amendment to the Constitution of the United States in December 1865; andWHEREAS, June 19, 1865, signaled a day of healing after decades of national divide over racial injustice; andWHEREAS, Over the course of its history, the United States has grown into a symbol of democracy and freedom around the world; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly and the Senate of the State of California, jointly, That the Legislature respectfully urges the President of the United States to declare June 19, commonly known as Juneteenth Independence Day, as a federal holiday; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the President and Vice President of the United States, to the Speaker of the United States House of Representatives, to the Majority Leader of the United States Senate, to each Senator and Representative from California in the Congress of the United States, to the Governor, and to the author for appropriate distribution.

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Joint Resolution No. 36Introduced by Assembly Member LackeyJune 17, 2020 Relative to Juneteenth Independence Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAJR 36, as introduced, Lackey. Juneteenth Independence Day.This measure would urge the President of the United States to declare June 19, commonly known as Juneteenth Independence Day, as a federal holiday.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO 





 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION

 Assembly Joint Resolution 

No. 36

Introduced by Assembly Member LackeyJune 17, 2020

Introduced by Assembly Member Lackey
June 17, 2020

 Relative to Juneteenth Independence Day. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

AJR 36, as introduced, Lackey. Juneteenth Independence Day.

This measure would urge the President of the United States to declare June 19, commonly known as Juneteenth Independence Day, as a federal holiday.

This measure would urge the President of the United States to declare June 19, commonly known as Juneteenth Independence Day, as a federal holiday.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, News of the end of slavery did not reach the frontier areas of the United States, in particular the southwestern states, until months after the conclusion of the Civil War, more than two and one-half years after President Abraham Lincoln issued the Emancipation Proclamation on September 22, 1862, effective on January 1, 1863; and

WHEREAS, On June 19, 1865, Union soldiers, led by Major General Gordon Granger, arrived in Galveston, Texas, with news that the Civil War had ended and the enslaved were free; and

WHEREAS, African Americans who had been slaves in the southwest celebrated June 19, commonly known as Juneteenth Independence Day, as inspiration and encouragement for future generations; and

WHEREAS, African Americans from all over the United States have continued the tradition of observing Juneteenth Independence Day for more than 150 years; and

WHEREAS, Juneteenth Independence Day began as a holiday in the state of Texas and is now celebrated in 47 states and the District of Columbia as a special day of observance in recognition of the emancipation of all slaves in the United States; and

WHEREAS, Juneteenth Independence Day celebrations have been held to honor African American freedom while encouraging self-development and respect for all cultures; and

WHEREAS, The faith and strength of character demonstrated by former slaves and the descendants of former slaves remain an example for all people of the United States, regardless of background, religion, or race; and

WHEREAS, Slavery was not officially abolished until the ratification of the 13th Amendment to the Constitution of the United States in December 1865; and

WHEREAS, June 19, 1865, signaled a day of healing after decades of national divide over racial injustice; and

WHEREAS, Over the course of its history, the United States has grown into a symbol of democracy and freedom around the world; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Assembly and the Senate of the State of California, jointly, That the Legislature respectfully urges the President of the United States to declare June 19, commonly known as Juneteenth Independence Day, as a federal holiday; and be it further

Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the President and Vice President of the United States, to the Speaker of the United States House of Representatives, to the Majority Leader of the United States Senate, to each Senator and Representative from California in the Congress of the United States, to the Governor, and to the author for appropriate distribution.