Assembly | 07/02/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 103, Statutes of 2019. | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2019 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/27/2019 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/27/2019 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 1818.) | ||
Senate | 06/11/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 11). | ||
Senate | 06/04/2019 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/04/2019 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2019 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 14. Page 530.) | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2019 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (February 26). | ||
Assembly | 01/28/2019 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 01/18/2019 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2019 | Introduced. To print. |