Assembly | 07/02/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 104, Statutes of 2019. | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2019 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/27/2019 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/27/2019 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 1819.) | ||
Senate | 06/11/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 11). | ||
Senate | 05/29/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2019 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2019 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 11. Page 1723.) | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2019 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2019 | Amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2019 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (May 7). | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2019 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2019 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2019 | Introduced. To print. |