Assembly | 04/22/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Page 1244.). | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2019 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 10). | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2019 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2019 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2019 | Introduced. |