LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2019-2020 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AR44
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AR44
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2019-2020 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AR44
Action History
Assembly
08/30/2019
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 2910.).
Assembly
08/27/2019
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 26).
Assembly
08/20/2019
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Assembly
08/19/2019
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Amended.
Assembly
07/01/2019
Referred to Com. on JUD.
Assembly
06/11/2019
Introduced.