California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AR47 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION House Resolution No. 47Introduced by Assembly Members Choi and Quirk-Silva(Principal coauthors: Assembly Members Medina and Patterson)June 26, 2019 Relative to Dosan Ahn Chang Ho Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTHR 47, as introduced, Choi. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, Dosan Ahn Chang Ho is regarded as one of the most significant patriotic figures by Koreans at home and abroad; andWHEREAS, Korean independence leader Dosan Ahn Chang Ho was born on November 9, 1878, in Korea. He is to the Korean and Korean American community as Mahatma Gandhi is seen to the people of India, for he is held in highest esteem; andWHEREAS, As a teenager, Dosan Ahn Chang Hos desire for a modern education led him to enroll in an American missionary-run school, the Miller Academy, in Seoul, Korea, where he became a Christian and graduated at 18 years of age in 1897, and to establish the Jeom Jin School, which was the first modern school in the country, in 1899; andWHEREAS, American missionary educated, Dosan Ahn Chang Ho wished to know more about America, especially its educational system. This desire led him to come to America, where he arrived in San Francisco on October 14, 1902; andWHEREAS, Dosan Ahn Chang Ho spent thirteen years of his life in the United States, primarily in California. This experience led him to many observations of American life, including politics, economics, and education; andWHEREAS, Dosan Ahn Chang Ho helped and organized the early Korean immigrants who came to the United States to work on Hawaiian sugar plantations into a self-help community. He established the first organized Korean American settlement, Korean National Association, and a labor agency. Dosan Ahn Chang Hos organizational leadership helped lead to the success of the Korean American community within California; andWHEREAS, When Korea was annexed and occupied by Japan from 1910 to 1945, Dosan Ahn Chang Ho spearheaded the Korean independence movement. His goal was for Koreans to promote and adopt democracy. His influence and actions helped Koreans understand the importance of a free nation, and today democracy is firmly rooted in South Korea; andWHEREAS, Dosan Ahn Chang Ho founded the Young Korean Academy, also known as the Heungsadahn, in San Francisco in 1913. It is still a robust organization dedicated to training and educating Koreans to cultivate morals and ethics that help build inner strength, community consciousness, and good citizenship; andWHEREAS, The Korean American immigrant experience was, then, vastly enhanced by Dosan Ahn Chang Hos leadership, and even today his pioneering and patriotic spirit still lives on in the minds of Korean immigrants; andWHEREAS, November 9, 2018, was declared Dosan Ahn Chang Ho Day; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, That the Assembly adopts and declares November 9, 2019, and each November 9 thereafter, as Dosan Ahn Chang Ho Day, as recognized in the previous year; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.
22
33 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION House Resolution No. 47Introduced by Assembly Members Choi and Quirk-Silva(Principal coauthors: Assembly Members Medina and Patterson)June 26, 2019 Relative to Dosan Ahn Chang Ho Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTHR 47, as introduced, Choi. Digest Key
44
55
66
77
88
99 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION
1010
1111 House Resolution No. 47
1212
1313 Introduced by Assembly Members Choi and Quirk-Silva(Principal coauthors: Assembly Members Medina and Patterson)June 26, 2019
1414
1515 Introduced by Assembly Members Choi and Quirk-Silva(Principal coauthors: Assembly Members Medina and Patterson)
1616 June 26, 2019
1717
1818 Relative to Dosan Ahn Chang Ho Day.
1919
2020 LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
2121
2222 ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
2323
2424 HR 47, as introduced, Choi.
2525
2626
2727
2828 ## Digest Key
2929
3030 ## Bill Text
3131
3232 WHEREAS, Dosan Ahn Chang Ho is regarded as one of the most significant patriotic figures by Koreans at home and abroad; and
3333
3434 WHEREAS, Korean independence leader Dosan Ahn Chang Ho was born on November 9, 1878, in Korea. He is to the Korean and Korean American community as Mahatma Gandhi is seen to the people of India, for he is held in highest esteem; and
3535
3636 WHEREAS, As a teenager, Dosan Ahn Chang Hos desire for a modern education led him to enroll in an American missionary-run school, the Miller Academy, in Seoul, Korea, where he became a Christian and graduated at 18 years of age in 1897, and to establish the Jeom Jin School, which was the first modern school in the country, in 1899; and
3737
3838 WHEREAS, American missionary educated, Dosan Ahn Chang Ho wished to know more about America, especially its educational system. This desire led him to come to America, where he arrived in San Francisco on October 14, 1902; and
3939
4040 WHEREAS, Dosan Ahn Chang Ho spent thirteen years of his life in the United States, primarily in California. This experience led him to many observations of American life, including politics, economics, and education; and
4141
4242 WHEREAS, Dosan Ahn Chang Ho helped and organized the early Korean immigrants who came to the United States to work on Hawaiian sugar plantations into a self-help community. He established the first organized Korean American settlement, Korean National Association, and a labor agency. Dosan Ahn Chang Hos organizational leadership helped lead to the success of the Korean American community within California; and
4343
4444 WHEREAS, When Korea was annexed and occupied by Japan from 1910 to 1945, Dosan Ahn Chang Ho spearheaded the Korean independence movement. His goal was for Koreans to promote and adopt democracy. His influence and actions helped Koreans understand the importance of a free nation, and today democracy is firmly rooted in South Korea; and
4545
4646 WHEREAS, Dosan Ahn Chang Ho founded the Young Korean Academy, also known as the Heungsadahn, in San Francisco in 1913. It is still a robust organization dedicated to training and educating Koreans to cultivate morals and ethics that help build inner strength, community consciousness, and good citizenship; and
4747
4848 WHEREAS, The Korean American immigrant experience was, then, vastly enhanced by Dosan Ahn Chang Hos leadership, and even today his pioneering and patriotic spirit still lives on in the minds of Korean immigrants; and
4949
5050 WHEREAS, November 9, 2018, was declared Dosan Ahn Chang Ho Day; now, therefore, be it
5151
5252 Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, That the Assembly adopts and declares November 9, 2019, and each November 9 thereafter, as Dosan Ahn Chang Ho Day, as recognized in the previous year; and be it further
5353
5454 Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.