Assembly | 08/26/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Page 2843.). | ||
Assembly | 08/26/2019 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 08/22/2019 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 08/22/2019 | From Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 19). | ||
Assembly | 08/15/2019 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/12/2019 | Introduced. |