Assembly | 01/22/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 60. Noes 14. Page 205.). | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2019 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 01/18/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (January 18). | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2019 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 01/14/2019 | (pending referral to Com. on JUD.) | ||
Assembly | 01/14/2019 | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 165.) | ||
Assembly | 01/10/2019 | Introduced. |