Assembly | 02/20/2020 | Read. Adopted. (Page 4094.). | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2020 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2020 | (Page 4046.) | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2020 | Amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2020 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (February 6). | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2020 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 01/28/2020 | Introduced. |