California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AR79

Introduced
1/29/20  
Introduced
1/29/20  
Refer
2/6/20  
Refer
2/6/20  
Passed
2/10/20  

Caption

Relative to American Heart Month and Wear Red Day.

Impact

The resolution encourages citizens to engage in health-promoting behaviors such as regular physical activity, healthy eating, and effective management of hypertension. It emphasizes that a significant percentage of cardiac events can be avoided through lifestyle changes and education. By promoting awareness and encouraging proactive steps, the resolution aims to reduce the incidence of heart disease, particularly among women, who are often disproportionately affected.

Summary

House Resolution No. 79, introduced by Assembly Member Carrillo, aims to recognize February 2020 as American Heart Month and February 7, 2020, as Wear Red Day in California. The resolution highlights the critical issue of cardiovascular diseases, which remain the leading cause of death among both men and women in the United States. The initiative is part of a broader effort to raise awareness about heart health and to promote preventive measures against heart disease and stroke.

Contention

While the resolution is primarily an awareness campaign and does not enact new laws, it seeks to mobilize community action and support for health initiatives focused on cardiovascular health. There may be contention surrounding resource allocations for preventive programs, as well as differing opinions on the effectiveness of awareness campaigns compared to direct health interventions. The involvement of the American Heart Association's Go Red For Women Campaign demonstrates the collaborative effort to address this critical health issue.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

CA ACR67

Atherosclerotic cardiovascular disease (ASCVD).

CA ACR66

Diabetes and Cardiovascular Disease Awareness Month.

MI HR0018

A resolution to declare February 2025 as American Heart Month and February 5, 2025, as National Wear Red Day in the state of Michigan.

MI SR0068

A resolution to recognize September 2023 as Cholesterol Education Month and September 1, 2023, as Low-Density Lipoprotein Cholesterol (LDL-C) Awareness Day.

MI SR0007

A resolution to recognize February 2023 as American Heart Month and February 3, 2023, as “National Wear Red Day”.

MI HR0051

A resolution to declare March 2, 2023, as Cardiovascular Disease Awareness Day in the state of Michigan.

GA HB459

Heart Health for All Act; enact

MI HR0029

A resolution to declare February 2023 as American Heart Month and February 3, 2023, as National Wear Red Day in the state of Michigan.