|
01/13/2020
|
Veto sustained.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2020
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2019
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2019
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/17/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2609.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3042.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2019
|
August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2019
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2019
|
June 11 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1194.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1087.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
April 8 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2019
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 490.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2019
|
Set for hearing March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/04/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/03/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|