Assembly | 08/30/2020 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. | ||
Assembly | 08/25/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 08/24/2020 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 08/20/2020 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 18). | ||
Assembly | 08/06/2020 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 08/05/2020 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 4). | ||
Assembly | 07/27/2020 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2020 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 06/11/2020 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2020 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3680.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2020 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2020 | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3533.) (May 13). | ||
Senate | 05/11/2020 | Set for hearing May 13. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2020 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2020 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |