Senate
|
09/01/2020
|
Ordered to inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2020
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 9. Page 5412.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2020
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2020
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2020
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2020
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 8. Page 3794.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3613.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2020
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2020
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2020
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|