Senate | 05/18/2020 | May 18 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 4. Noes 5. Page 3549.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2020 | Set for hearing May 18. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2020 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2020 | Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2020 | March 23 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2020 | Set for hearing March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2020 | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2020 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2020 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |