California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB106 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2019

Enrolled

Bill June 26, 2019

Chaptered

Bill July 1, 2019

Amended

Bill June 20, 2019
Bill June 17, 2019