California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1085 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2020

Amended

Bill August 25, 2020
Bill August 24, 2020
Bill August 3, 2020
Bill June 18, 2020
Bill May 27, 2020
Bill May 18, 2020
Bill March 24, 2020