Senate | 03/18/2020 | March 30 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2020 | Set for hearing March 30. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2020 | March 23 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2020 | Set for hearing March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2020 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2020 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2020 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |