Assembly | 07/27/2020 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2020 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 06/25/2020 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2020 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3838.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2020 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 06/04/2020 | Set for hearing June 9. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2020 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2020 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3622.) (May 29). | ||
Senate | 05/22/2020 | Set for hearing May 29. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2020 | April 1 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2020 | Set for hearing April 1. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2020 | Referred to Com. on EQ. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2020 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2020 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |