Senate | 02/03/2020 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2019 | May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2019 | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2019 | Set for hearing May 13. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2019 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2019 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 847.) (April 24). | ||
Senate | 03/22/2019 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2019 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 12/04/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. | ||
Senate | 12/03/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |