California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1102 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2020

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2020

Amended

Bill August 25, 2020
Bill July 13, 2020
Bill May 5, 2020
Bill April 22, 2020
Bill April 8, 2020
Bill March 26, 2020