California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB113 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 17, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2019

Amended

Bill September 6, 2019
Bill August 28, 2019