Assembly | 06/29/2020 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 06/22/2020 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2020 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 3793.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2020 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2020 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3569.) (May 20). | ||
Senate | 05/12/2020 | Set for hearing May 20. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2020 | March 31 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/04/2020 | Set for hearing March 31. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2020 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2020 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |