Senate | 04/01/2020 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2020 | March 31 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2020 | Set for hearing March 31. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2020 | March 24 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2020 | Set for hearing March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2020 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2020 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2020 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |