California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1138 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2020

Amended

Bill August 27, 2020
Bill August 25, 2020
Bill August 24, 2020
Bill July 27, 2020
Bill March 24, 2020