Senate | 05/12/2020 | Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2020 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2020 | April 1 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2020 | Set for hearing April 1. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2020 | Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2020 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2020 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |